AL HB513 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Code of Alabama 1975, Acts of 2018 Regular Session, supplements and certain replacement volumes, codified with certain corrections, local laws of certain counties codified, duties of Secretary of State
Title
Code of Alabama 1975, Acts of 2018 Regular Session, supplements and certain replacement volumes, codified with certain corrections, local laws of certain counties codified, duties of Secretary of State
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2019-05-15 | House | England intended to vote "Yea" |
2019-05-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 738 |
2019-05-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-14 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |