AL HB52 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-25 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-25 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement officers, reserve deputies and reserve police officers, educational assistance provided, peace officer definition further defined, Secs. 36-21-102, 36-30-1 am'd.
Title
Law enforcement officers, reserve deputies and reserve police officers, educational assistance provided, peace officer definition further defined, Secs. 36-21-102, 36-30-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Wood (R) motion to Table (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Wood (R) motion to Table (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2019-04-23 | House | Engrossed |
2019-04-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 358 |
2019-04-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 357 |
2019-04-23 | House | Collins Amendment Offered |
2019-04-23 | House | Wood (R) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 356 |
2019-04-23 | House | Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered |
2019-04-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |