AL HB53 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:18 a.m. on April 25, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:18 a.m. on April 25, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Calhoun Co., bingo, operation limited in unincorporated area of co., Amendment 508, Constitution of Alabama of 1901, (Section 1, Local Amendments, Calhoun Co., Recompiled Constitution of Alabama of 1901), am'd., const. amend.
Title
Calhoun Co., bingo, operation limited in unincorporated area of co., Amendment 508, Constitution of Alabama of 1901, (Section 1, Local Amendments, Calhoun Co., Recompiled Constitution of Alabama of 1901), am'd., const. amend.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Motion to Local Application (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 30 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 29 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Motion to Local Application (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 30 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 29 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:18 a.m. on April 25, 2019. |
2019-04-25 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-80 on 04/25/2019. |
2019-04-25 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-04-23 | House | Enrolled |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 388 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reported from Committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and rereferred to committee Tourism |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-04-04 | House | Engrossed |
2019-04-04 | House | Motion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 109 |
2019-04-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 108 |
2019-04-04 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 107 |
2019-04-04 | House | Economic Development and Tourism Amendment Offered |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-03-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-20 | House | Rereferred from Calendar to Local Legislation |
2019-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |