AL HB545 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - County and Municipal Government first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - County and Municipal Government first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Mayor, power to make appointments, specified, Sec. 11-43-81 am'd.
Title
Mayor, power to make appointments, specified, Sec. 11-43-81 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. K.L. Brown [R] | Rep. Terri Collins [R] | Rep. Joe Faust [R] | Rep. Ed Henry [R] |
Rep. Mark Tuggle [R] | Rep. Dan Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | County and Municipal Government first Amendment Offered | |
2011-06-02 | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections | |
2011-06-02 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-06-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections | |
2011-06-01 | Engrossed | |
2011-06-01 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1028 | |
2011-06-01 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1027 | |
2011-06-01 | England Amendment Offered | |
2011-06-01 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1026 | |
2011-06-01 | Knight Amendment Offered | |
2011-06-01 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1025 | |
2011-06-01 | Vance Amendment Offered | |
2011-06-01 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1024 | |
2011-06-01 | McMillan Amendment Offered | |
2011-06-01 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1023 | |
2011-06-01 | County and Municipal Government Amendment Offered | |
2011-06-01 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2011-04-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |