AL HB545 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - Delivered to Governor at 1:54 p.m. on March 20, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - Delivered to Governor at 1:54 p.m. on March 20, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Florence and St. Florian, corp. limits alt., certain property deannexed from Town of St. Florian and annexed to City of Florence
Title
Florence and St. Florian, corp. limits alt., certain property deannexed from Town of St. Florian and annexed to City of Florence
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Greer [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:54 p.m. on March 20, 2014. |
2014-03-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-266. |
2014-03-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-03-20 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 944 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 521 |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-04 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-26 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |