AL HB549 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Public Health, require Dept of Public Health to provide education to public regarding care for Alzheimer's and dementia patients, provide funding, Secs. 22-50-70, 22-50-71, 22-50-72, 22-50-73, 22-50-74 repealed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health, require Dept of Public Health to provide education to public regarding care for Alzheimer's and dementia patients, provide funding, Secs. 22-50-70, 22-50-71, 22-50-72, 22-50-73, 22-50-74 repealed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on May 31, 2019.
2019-05-31HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-453.
2019-05-31HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-31HouseEnrolled
2019-05-31SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-30HousePassed Second House
2019-05-30SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1428
2019-05-30SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-29SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-28SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry
2019-05-23HouseEngrossed
2019-05-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1041
2019-05-23HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1040
2019-05-23HouseState Government Amendment Offered
2019-05-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-05-14HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2019-05-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback