AL HB553 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Forwarded to Governor on May 23, 2019 at 1:08 p.m. on May 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Forwarded to Governor on May 23, 2019 at 1:08 p.m. on May 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bibb Co., sales and use tax, county comm. authorized to levy, conditions for levy based on retirement of certain school debt, distrib. for education and co. gen. fund
Title
Bibb Co., sales and use tax, county comm. authorized to levy, conditions for levy based on retirement of certain school debt, distrib. for education and co. gen. fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 86 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 86 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 23, 2019 at 1:08 p.m. on May 23, 2019. |
2019-05-23 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-332. |
2019-05-23 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-23 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-23 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1030 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-05-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 569 |
2019-05-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |