AL HB57 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Theft by deception, aggravated, crime enacted, theft of cash or financial instruments or public funds over certain amounts, penalties, parole regulated, Sec. 13A-8-2.1 added; Secs. 15-22-33, 15-22-54, 17-3-30.1 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Theft by deception, aggravated, crime enacted, theft of cash or financial instruments or public funds over certain amounts, penalties, parole regulated, Sec. 13A-8-2.1 added; Secs. 15-22-33, 15-22-54, 17-3-30.1 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29HouseDelivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
2019-05-29HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-513.
2019-05-29HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-29SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-28HouseEnrolled
2019-05-28HousePassed Second House
2019-05-28SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1219
2019-05-28SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-08SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-25SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2019-04-25HouseEngrossed
2019-04-25HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 372
2019-04-25HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 371
2019-04-25HouseJudiciary first Substitute Offered
2019-04-25HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2019-03-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB57&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB57-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB57-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB57-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/198793-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=613058&VOTE=371&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=613059&VOTE=372&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=624550&VOTE=1219&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback