AL HB597 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Delivered to Governor at 9:17 a.m. on May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Delivered to Governor at 9:17 a.m. on May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement officers, murdered in line of duty, state employee granted administrative leave when subpoenaed for trial
Title
Law enforcement officers, murdered in line of duty, state employee granted administrative leave when subpoenaed for trial
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:17 a.m. on May 30, 2019. |
2019-05-30 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-379. |
2019-05-30 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-29 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1337 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2019-05-21 | House | Howard intended to vote "Yea" |
2019-05-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 819 |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-14 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |