AL HB6 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Education with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Education, public school K-12, minimum mandatory age of attendance decreased from seven to six, Sec. 16-28-3 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education, public school K-12, minimum mandatory age of attendance decreased from seven to six, Sec. 16-28-3 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 58 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - Merrill motion to Table (Y: 46 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 44 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - Merrill motion to Table (Y: 40 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2011-04-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 49 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - Merrill motion to Table (Y: 37 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2011-04-19 - House - Collins motion to Table (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 47) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - Collins motion to Table (Y: 35 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 47) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-26 Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Education with 1 amendment
2011-05-26 Education first Amendment Offered
2011-05-26 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2011-04-19 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education
2011-04-19 Engrossed
2011-04-19 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 344
2011-04-19 Merrill motion to Table adopted Roll Call 343
2011-04-19 Williams (J) motion to Carry Over Until Specified Time tabled
2011-04-19 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 342
2011-04-19 Merrill motion to Table lost Roll Call 341
2011-04-19 Warren Amendment Offered
2011-04-19 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 340
2011-04-19 Merrill motion to Table lost Roll Call 339
2011-04-19 Collins motion to Table adopted Roll Call 338
2011-04-19 Williams (J) Substitute Amendment Offered
2011-04-19 Collins motion to Table adopted Roll Call 337
2011-04-19 Newton (C) Substitute Amendment Offered
2011-04-19 Collins Amendment Offered
2011-04-19 Third Reading Passed
2011-03-24 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2011-03-01 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB6
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/HB6-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/HB6-eng.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=405460&VOTE=337&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=405475&VOTE=338&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=405483&VOTE=339&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=405496&VOTE=340&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=405512&VOTE=341&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=405519&VOTE=342&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=405543&VOTE=343&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=405550&VOTE=344&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback