AL HB6 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Assigned Act No. 2015-81.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Municipalities, Class 7 or Class 8 with 12,000 or more inhabitants, mayors, vacancies, procedures for filling, Sec. 11-44G-2, Code of Alabama 1975, not to apply, Sec. 11-44G-2 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipalities, Class 7 or Class 8 with 12,000 or more inhabitants, mayors, vacancies, procedures for filling, Sec. 11-44G-2, Code of Alabama 1975, not to apply, Sec. 11-44G-2 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-21HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-81.
2015-04-21HouseForwarded to Governor on April 21, 2015 at 3:10 p.m. on April 21, 2015.
2015-04-21HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-04-21HouseEnrolled
2015-04-21SenateSignature Requested
2015-04-21HousePassed Second House
2015-04-16SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 552
2015-04-16SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-04-16SenateWard motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2015-04-16SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2015-04-02SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-03-17SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on County and Municipal Government
2015-03-17HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 79
2015-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-03-05HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-03-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback