AL HB620 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 9:19 a.m. on May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 9:19 a.m. on May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Baldwin Co., toll road and bridge authority, authorized to be estab. by local law, project from end of Beach Express to U.S. I-65, bonds, tolls, const. amend.
Title
Baldwin Co., toll road and bridge authority, authorized to be estab. by local law, project from end of Beach Express to U.S. I-65, bonds, tolls, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Singleton motion to adopt Local Application Resolution (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Local Application Resolution submitted Roll Call 894 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 60 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 35 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Local Application Resolution submitted Roll Call 894 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 60 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 35 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 9:19 a.m. on May 30, 2019. |
2019-05-30 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-300. |
2019-05-30 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-29 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Singleton motion to adopt Local Application Resolution adopted Roll Call 1312 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1311 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Local Application Resolution submitted Roll Call 894 |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 893 |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation |