AL HB628 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Morgan Co., T.V.A. distribution of designated portion under Act 2010-135, distrib until fiscal year commencing October 1, 2021, use of any remaining funds further provided
Title
Morgan Co., T.V.A. distribution of designated portion under Act 2010-135, distrib until fiscal year commencing October 1, 2021, use of any remaining funds further provided
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 78 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-05-28 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1061 |
2019-05-28 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |