AL HB7 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacy Bd., appeals of decisions to circuit court, venue in county where aggrieved party resides or board is located, Sec. 34-23-94 am'd.
Title
Pharmacy Bd., appeals of decisions to circuit court, venue in county where aggrieved party resides or board is located, Sec. 34-23-94 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019. |
2019-05-29 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-357. |
2019-05-29 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-28 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-28 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1187 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-11 | House | Engrossed |
2019-04-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 184 |
2019-04-11 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 183 |
2019-04-11 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |