AL HB75 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Real property, annexation, property with overlapped police jurisdictions, all property to be annexed with consent of all parties and affected municipalities under certain conditions, Sec. 11-42-21 am'd.
Title
Real property, annexation, property with overlapped police jurisdictions, all property to be annexed with consent of all parties and affected municipalities under certain conditions, Sec. 11-42-21 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 amendment |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Judiciary first Amendment Offered |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2019-05-23 | House | Engrossed |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 963 |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 962 |
2019-05-23 | House | County and Municipal Government Amendment Offered |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |