AL HB76 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Controlled substances, prescribing or dispensing, required to be only for a medical purpose, criminal penalties, Secs. 20-2-58, 20-2-71 am'd.
Title
Controlled substances, prescribing or dispensing, required to be only for a medical purpose, criminal penalties, Secs. 20-2-58, 20-2-71 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on May 31, 2019. |
2019-05-31 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-537. |
2019-05-31 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1391 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare |
2019-04-16 | House | Engrossed |
2019-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 210 |
2019-04-16 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 209 |
2019-04-16 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2019-04-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-03-21 | House | Rereferred from Health to Judiciary |
2019-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |