AL HJR136 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 67-38)
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Forwarded to Governor at 10:30 a. m. on March 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 67-38)
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Forwarded to Governor at 10:30 a. m. on March 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority, Inc., commended
Title
Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority, Inc., commended
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Forwarded to Governor at 10:30 a. m. on March 1, 2012. | |
2012-03-01 | Assigned Act No. 2012-75 on 03/07/2012. | |
2012-03-01 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-03-01 | Signature Requested | |
2012-03-01 | Enrolled | |
2012-02-28 | Passed Second House | |
2012-02-28 | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-02-28 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-02-23 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2012-02-21 | Galliher motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-02-21 | Introduced |