AL HJR18 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative Services Agency Bassett Conference Room, named
Title
Legislative Services Agency Bassett Conference Room, named
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Enrolled |
2019-04-03 | House | Delivered to Governor at 34:28 p.m. on April 3, 2019. |
2019-04-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-15. |
2019-04-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-04-02 | House | Enrolled |
2019-04-02 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2019-03-19 | House | Gaston motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2019-03-19 | House | Introduced |