AL HJR201 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 10:00 a.m. on May 16, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Birmingham Fire Fighters Association Local 117, 100th anniversary, commended

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Birmingham Fire Fighters Association Local 117, 100th anniversary, commended

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:00 a.m. on May 16, 2019.
2019-05-16HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-256.
2019-05-16HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-16SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-15HouseEnrolled
2019-05-15HousePassed Second House
2019-05-15SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-15SenateReported from Rules
2019-05-14SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2019-05-14HouseJones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-14HouseReported from Rules
2019-05-08HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback