AL HJR23 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-25 - Assigned Act No. 2018-23.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-25 - Assigned Act No. 2018-23.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Congress, application for Constitutional Convention to limit members terms
Title
Congress, application for Constitutional Convention to limit members terms
Sponsors
Rep. Kerry Rich [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-25 - Senate - Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-23. |
2018-01-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:05 P.M. on January 25, 2018. |
2018-01-25 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-01-25 | House | Enrolled |
2018-01-25 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 102 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2018-01-11 | House | Jones motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-01-11 | House | Reported from Rules |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |