AL HJR231 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Forwarded to Governor on May 23, 2019 at 12:02 p.m. on May 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Wood, Barry, commended

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wood, Barry, commended

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseForwarded to Governor on May 23, 2019 at 12:02 p.m. on May 23, 2019.
2019-05-23HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-289.
2019-05-23HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-23HouseEnrolled
2019-05-23SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-23HousePassed Second House
2019-05-23SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-23SenateReported from Rules
2019-05-22SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2019-05-21HouseJones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-21HouseReported from Rules
2019-05-15HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback