AL HJR265 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Red Snapper fishery, Congressional delegation and Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, Marine Resources Division, commended re efforts to secure management
Title
Red Snapper fishery, Congressional delegation and Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, Marine Resources Division, commended re efforts to secure management
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-30 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 30, 2019 at 1:35 p.m. on May 30, 2019. |
2019-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:35 p.m. on May 30, 2019. |
2019-05-30 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-430. |
2019-05-30 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-30 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2019-05-29 | House | Jones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-29 | House | Reported from Rules |
2019-05-23 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |