AL HJR278 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 1:05 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 1:05 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ecumenical Ministries, Inc., commended
Title
Ecumenical Ministries, Inc., commended
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Faust [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:05 p.m. on May 31, 2019. |
2019-05-31 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-431. |
2019-05-31 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-31 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2019-05-30 | House | Jones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-30 | House | Reported from Rules |
2019-05-28 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |