AL HJR72 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Butler, Don Darius, new paster of First Missionary Baptist Church in Huntsville, commended

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Butler, Don Darius, new paster of First Missionary Baptist Church in Huntsville, commended

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseEnrolled
2019-04-18HouseForwarded to Governor on April 18, 2019 at 11:34 a.m. on April 18, 2019.
2019-04-18HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-77.
2019-04-18HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-04-18HouseEnrolled
2019-04-18SenateSignature Requested
2019-04-18HousePassed Second House
2019-04-16SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2019-04-16SenateReported from Rules
2019-04-04SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2019-04-04HouseJones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2019-04-04HouseReported from Rules
2019-04-02HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback