AL HJR8 | 2015 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Delivered to Governor at 6:49 p.m. on August 10, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Delivered to Governor at 6:49 p.m. on August 10, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal police jurisdiction laws, joint interim legislative committee created to study
Title
Municipal police jurisdiction laws, joint interim legislative committee created to study
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-10 | House | Delivered to Governor at 6:49 p.m. on August 10, 2015. |
2015-08-10 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-510. |
2015-08-10 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-08-10 | House | Enrolled |
2015-08-10 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2015-08-07 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2015-08-07 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2015-08-07 | House | Reported from Rules |
2015-08-05 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |