AL HJR91 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Delivered to Governor at 3:21 p.m. on April 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Sergeant Wytasha L. Carter Memorial Highway, portion of Interstate 20/59 in Jefferson Co., named

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sergeant Wytasha L. Carter Memorial Highway, portion of Interstate 20/59 in Jefferson Co., named

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23HouseDelivered to Governor at 3:21 p.m. on April 23, 2019.
2019-04-23HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-84.
2019-04-23HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-04-23SenateSignature Requested
2019-04-18HouseEnrolled
2019-04-18HousePassed Second House
2019-04-18SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2019-04-18SenateReported from Rules
2019-04-16SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2019-04-16HouseJones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2019-04-16HouseReported from Rules
2019-04-09HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback