AL SB11 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-480.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-480.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Civil procedure, statute of limitations. sex offense, further provided, statute of limitations tolled until vicitim reaches age of majority, Sec. 6-2-8 am'd.
Title
Civil procedure, statute of limitations. sex offense, further provided, statute of limitations tolled until vicitim reaches age of majority, Sec. 6-2-8 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Coleman-Madison motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-480. |
2019-05-30 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-30 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Coleman-Madison motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1385 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1197 |
2019-05-30 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1196 |
2019-05-30 | House | Judiciary first Substitute Offered |
2019-05-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2019-04-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 80 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Givhan motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 79 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Givhan Amendment Offered |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Coleman-Madison motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 75 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary as Favorable with 1 amendment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |