AL SB129 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Rereferred from SG to C&SB
Pending: House Commerce and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Rereferred from SG to C&SB
Pending: House Commerce and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Protect Alabama Small Businesses Act, regulation of franchisers and representatives in effort to prevent fraud, unfair business practices and abuses on franchisees, penalties
Title
Protect Alabama Small Businesses Act, regulation of franchisers and representatives in effort to prevent fraud, unfair business practices and abuses on franchisees, penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Elliott motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Elliott motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Rereferred from SG to C&SB |
2019-05-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 699 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Elliott motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Givhan motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 671 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Givhan Amendment Offered |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Elliott motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 670 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Elliott first Substitute Offered |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Elliott motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported from Governmental Affairs as Favorable with 1 amendment |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |