AL SB141 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Assigned Act No. 2019-488.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Assigned Act No. 2019-488.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Wildlife Center, exempt from payment of all state, county, and municipal sales and use taxes, Sec. 40-23-5 am'd.
Title
Alabama Wildlife Center, exempt from payment of all state, county, and municipal sales and use taxes, Sec. 40-23-5 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-488. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-31 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-31 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1261 |
2019-05-31 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-30 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 163 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 162 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |