AL SB147 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Assigned Act No. 2019-132.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Assigned Act No. 2019-132.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Retirement, benefits for local employers participating in ERS, retirement benefits given to Tier I plan members authorized for Tier II plan members, Sec. 36-27-6.5 added
Title
Retirement, benefits for local employers participating in ERS, retirement benefits given to Tier I plan members authorized for Tier II plan members, Sec. 36-27-6.5 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Table (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Elliott motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Table (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Elliott motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-132. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-02 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 462 |
2019-05-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 274 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 273 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Orr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Table lost Roll Call 186 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Elliott motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 185 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Elliott Amendment Offered |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 184 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Waggoner Amendment Offered |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |