AL SB175 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from County and Municipal Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from County and Municipal Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Municipalities, council-manager form of government, procedures and timing further provided for, petition and election required, ballot, Secs. 11-43A-1.1, 11-43A-7, 11-43A-8 am'd.
Title
Municipalities, council-manager form of government, procedures and timing further provided for, petition and election required, ballot, Secs. 11-43A-1.1, 11-43A-7, 11-43A-8 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from County and Municipal Government |
2019-05-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 633 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |