AL SB198 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-497.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-497.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Courts, Administrative Director of Courts, appointment by the Supreme Court of Alabama, procedure established
Title
Courts, Administrative Director of Courts, appointment by the Supreme Court of Alabama, procedure established
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - Chestnut motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Chestnut motion to Accede (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Orr motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Chestnut motion to Accede (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Orr motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-497. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 11:23 a.m. on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Concurred in Conference Report |
2019-05-29 | House | Chestnut motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1155 |
2019-05-29 | House | Conference Report Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1263 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Conference Report |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-05-21 | House | Chestnut motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 849 House appoints Hill, Jones (M) and Chestnut |
2019-05-21 | House | Conference Committee Requested |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Orr motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 816 P&PO appoints Orr, Givhan and Singleton |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 680 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 679 |
2019-05-14 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2019-05-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-04-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 433 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 432 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Orr motion to adopted Voice Vote |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Orr motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 428 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 427 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |