AL SB206 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Employees' Retirement System, certain law enforcement officers of ALEA reclassified as Tier II state policeman, Sec. 41-27-7 am'd.
Title
Employees' Retirement System, certain law enforcement officers of ALEA reclassified as Tier II state policeman, Sec. 41-27-7 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Further Consideration |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Singleton motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Reported from Governmental Affairs as Favorable with 1 substitute |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |