AL SB23 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
Pending: House County and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
Pending: House County and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Municipalities, police jurisdiction, limited to police jurisdiction on the effective date of this act, planning jurisdiction, limited to corporate limits or police jurisdiction under certain conditions, Secs. 11-40-10, 11-52-30 am'd.
Title
Municipalities, police jurisdiction, limited to police jurisdiction on the effective date of this act, planning jurisdiction, limited to corporate limits or police jurisdiction under certain conditions, Secs. 11-40-10, 11-52-30 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Jones motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Elliott motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Jones motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Elliott motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 338 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 337 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Chambliss Amendment Offered |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Jones motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 336 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Jones Amendment Offered |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 335 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Singleton Amendment Offered |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Elliott motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 334 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Governmental Affairs first Substitute Offered |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported from Governmental Affairs as Favorable with 1 substitute |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |