AL SB240 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-476.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-476.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elections, judge of probate, authorized to appoint student interns to assist
Title
Elections, judge of probate, authorized to appoint student interns to assist
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-476. |
2019-05-30 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1218 |
2019-05-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 440 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported from Governmental Affairs as Favorable |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |