AL SB246 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Assigned Act No. 2019-398.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Assigned Act No. 2019-398.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Probate court, mentally ill persons, renewal of an involuntary commitment order, hearings, Sec. 22-52-10.10 added; Secs. 22-52-10.2, 22-52-10.3 am'd.
Title
Probate court, mentally ill persons, renewal of an involuntary commitment order, hearings, Sec. 22-52-10.10 added; Secs. 22-52-10.2, 22-52-10.3 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Gudger motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Gudger motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-398. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-28 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 944 |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 319 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Gudger motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 318 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Gudger Amendment Offered |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare |