AL SB248 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-21 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
Pending: House Ways and Means Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-21 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
Pending: House Ways and Means Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, adaptive equipment, exempt from sales and use taxes, Sec. 40-23-4 am'd.
Title
Taxation, adaptive equipment, exempt from sales and use taxes, Sec. 40-23-4 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 905 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |