AL SB256 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 3:25 on May 18, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 3:25 on May 18, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Marengo Co., judge of probate authorized to exercise equity jurisdiction under certain conditions, const. amend.
Title
Marengo Co., judge of probate authorized to exercise equity jurisdiction under certain conditions, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-18 - House - Motion to Local Application (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2020-05-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State at 3:25 on May 18, 2020 |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2020-173. |
2020-05-18 | House | Signature Requested |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2020-05-18 | House | Motion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 581 |
2020-05-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 580 |
2020-05-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-05-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Miscellaneous adopted Roll Call 571 |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 570 |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |