AL SB270 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Assigned Act No. 2019-165.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Assigned Act No. 2019-165.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Etowah Co., sheriff, feeding of prisoners further provided for, and for expense allowance for sheriff, Prisoner Food Fund established, const. amend.
Title
Etowah Co., sheriff, feeding of prisoners further provided for, and for expense allowance for sheriff, Prisoner Food Fund established, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to Local Application (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 46 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 38 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 38 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-165. |
2019-05-14 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 663 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 662 |
2019-05-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 396 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |