AL SB281 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-477.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-477.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama State University, board of trustees, Governor, serve as an ex officio member, selection of president and president pro tempore by membership of the board, Secs. 16-50-20, 16-50-26 am'd.
Title
Alabama State University, board of trustees, Governor, serve as an ex officio member, selection of president and president pro tempore by membership of the board, Secs. 16-50-20, 16-50-26 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-477. |
2019-05-30 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1203 |
2019-05-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 578 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 577 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Singleton first Substitute Offered |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy |