AL SB313 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 4:05 p.m. on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 4:05 p.m. on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Constitution of Alabama of 1901, right to vote limited to citizens of the United States, const. amend.
Title
Constitution of Alabama of 1901, right to vote limited to citizens of the United States, const. amend.
Sponsors
Sen. Del Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State at 4:05 p.m. on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1199 |
2019-05-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 666 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |