AL SB315 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Transportation and Energy first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Transportation and Energy first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Underground utilities, one-call notification system, notification further provided for, Underground Damage Prevention Fund, created, Secs. 37-15-10.1, 37-15-10.2 added; Secs. 37-15-2, 37-15-4, 37-15-4.1, 37-15-5, 37-15-6, 37-15-9, 37-15-10 am'd.
Title
Underground utilities, one-call notification system, notification further provided for, Underground Damage Prevention Fund, created, Secs. 37-15-10.1, 37-15-10.2 added; Secs. 37-15-2, 37-15-4, 37-15-4.1, 37-15-5, 37-15-6, 37-15-9, 37-15-10 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Roberts motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Roberts motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Roberts motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Roberts motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | Transportation and Energy first Amendment Offered |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-407. |
2019-05-29 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 931 |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 629 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Roberts motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 628 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Transportation and Energy Amendment Offered |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Roberts motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 627 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Transportation and Energy Amendment Offered |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |