AL SB321 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Assigned Act No. 2015-318.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Assigned Act No. 2015-318.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, drag racing, crime further defined, penalties increased, impoundment of vehicle and forfeiture for subsequent offenses, Sec. 32-5A-178 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicles, drag racing, crime further defined, penalties increased, impoundment of vehicle and forfeiture for subsequent offenses, Sec. 32-5A-178 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-318. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-05-28 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-05-28 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1276 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2015-05-26 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1092 |
2015-05-26 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1091 |
2015-05-26 | House | Public Safety and Homeland Security first Substitute Offered |
2015-05-26 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 802 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Engrossed |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 801 |
2015-05-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2015-05-05 | Senate | McClendon Amendment Offered |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Singleton motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 764 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Transportation and Energy first Substitute Offered |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Singleton motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Transportation and Energy first Substitute Offered |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |