AL SB327 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-09 - Forwarded to Governor on May 9, 2020 at 2:29 p.m. on May 9, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-09 - Forwarded to Governor on May 9, 2020 at 2:29 p.m. on May 9, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Opelika, corp. limits alt.
Title
Opelika, corp. limits alt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 58 Abs: 33) [FAIL]
2020-05-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2020-05-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-09 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor on May 9, 2020 at 2:29 p.m. on May 9, 2020 |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2020-179. |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-05-09 | House | Signature Requested |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2020-05-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 577 |
2020-05-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-08 | House | Lovvorn motion to Suspend Rules adopted Voice Vote |
2020-05-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-05-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Lee County Legislation |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 614 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |