AL SB331 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 9:53 a.m. on May 23, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 9:53 a.m. on May 23, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Baldwin Co., judge of probate authorized to exercise equity jurisdiction under certain conditions, const. amend.
Title
Baldwin Co., judge of probate authorized to exercise equity jurisdiction under certain conditions, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Local Application Resolution submitted Roll Call 869 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 42 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Simpson motion to Reconsider (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Motion to Local Application (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 62 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 30 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Albritton motion to adopt Local Application Resolution (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Simpson motion to Reconsider (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Motion to Local Application (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 62 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 30 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Albritton motion to adopt Local Application Resolution (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State at 9:53 a.m. on May 23, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-229. |
2019-05-23 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-22 | House | Local Application Resolution submitted Roll Call 869 |
2019-05-22 | House | Simpson motion to Reconsider adopted Roll Call 868 |
2019-05-22 | House | Local Application Resolution submitted Roll Call 859 |
2019-05-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 858 |
2019-05-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-21 | House | McMillan motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2019-05-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Albritton motion to adopt Local Application Resolution adopted Roll Call 652 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 651 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |