AL SB398 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Assigned Act No. 2019-510.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commission on Elementary and Secondary Education, Secretary of Elementary and Secondary Education, to submit ed. policy to Legislature, Governor required to consult with all minority caucuses when appointing minority members to the commission, contingent effective date

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commission on Elementary and Secondary Education, Secretary of Elementary and Secondary Education, to submit ed. policy to Legislature, Governor required to consult with all minority caucuses when appointing minority members to the commission, contingent effective date

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateAssigned Act No. 2019-510.
2019-05-31SenateMarsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1444
2019-05-31SenateConcurrence Requested
2019-05-31HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1259
2019-05-31HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1258
2019-05-31HouseHatcher Amendment Offered
2019-05-31HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1257
2019-05-31SenateEnrolled
2019-05-31HouseSignature Requested
2019-05-31HouseEducation Policy Amendment Offered
2019-05-31HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-05-31HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2019-05-22HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2019-05-21HouseRereferred from W&ME to EP
2019-05-15HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2019-05-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 815
2019-05-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-14SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB398&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB398-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB398-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201689-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/202370-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=619670&VOTE=815&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=627542&VOTE=1257&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=627544&VOTE=1258&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=627545&VOTE=1259&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=627574&VOTE=1444&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback