AL SB44 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-28 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from County and Municipal Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-28 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from County and Municipal Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Class 6 municipalities, golf carts, mun. may authorize on mun. streets, regulation, more restrictive ordinances authorized, penalties
Title
Class 6 municipalities, golf carts, mun. may authorize on mun. streets, regulation, more restrictive ordinances authorized, penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from County and Municipal Government |
2019-05-28 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1062 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |