AL SB5 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - County and Municipal Government first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Municipalities, mayors, vacancies, procedures for filling in municipalities with population of 12,000 or more inhabitants, Sec. 11-44G-2, Code of Alabama 1975, not to apply, Sec. 11-44G-2 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipalities, mayors, vacancies, procedures for filling in municipalities with population of 12,000 or more inhabitants, Sec. 11-44G-2, Code of Alabama 1975, not to apply, Sec. 11-44G-2 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-24HouseCounty and Municipal Government first Amendment Offered
2013-04-24HousePending third reading on day 25 Favorable from County and Municipal Government with 1 amendment
2013-04-24HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2013-04-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
2013-04-18SenateEngrossed
2013-04-16SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 455
2013-04-16SenateSmitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 454
2013-04-16SenateSmitherman Amendment Offered
2013-04-16SenateThird Reading Passed
2013-02-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-02-05SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback