AL SB5 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-504.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Athlete agents, prior to signing an agency contract, allow certain expenses to be paid to student athlete or the family of the athlete, Sec. 8-26B-14 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Athlete agents, prior to signing an agency contract, allow certain expenses to be paid to student athlete or the family of the athlete, Sec. 8-26B-14 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateAssigned Act No. 2019-504.
2019-05-30HouseSignature Requested
2019-05-30SenateEnrolled
2019-05-30SenatePassed Second House
2019-05-30HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1179
2019-05-30HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-18HouseActed on by State Government as Favorable
2019-04-04HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
2019-04-04SenateEngrossed
2019-04-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 131
2019-04-03SenateSmitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 130
2019-04-03SenateSmitherman Amendment Offered
2019-04-03SenateAllen motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2019-04-03SenateAllen Amendment Offered
2019-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-03-20SenateAllen motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2019-03-20SenateAllen Amendment Offered
2019-03-20SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2019-03-19SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-03-05SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB5&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB5-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB5-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/198064-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/198476-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=607766&VOTE=130&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=607767&VOTE=131&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626363&VOTE=1179&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback