AL SB68 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Assigned Act No. 2019-26.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Assigned Act No. 2019-26.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Akron, corp. limits, alt.
Title
Akron, corp. limits, alt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 76 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-26. |
2019-04-09 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-04-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 144 |
2019-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 111 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |